Accounts and annual returns NEW COVENANT CHURCH ELEPHANT AND CASTLE

Charity number: 1193301
Charity reporting is up to date (132 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 13 March 2025 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 13 March 2025 132 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2023 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 January 2022 22 February 2023 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2022 22 February 2023 113 days late Download Open in new window