Accounts and annual returns THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ASHFORD & SURROUNDING AREAS (GOCASA)

Charity Number: 1193645
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 03 October 2024 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 September 2022 On Time