Accounts and annual returns GLAMORGAN BRANCH PARACHUTE REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1193757
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 December 2024 18 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2024 16 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 December 2023 28 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2023 28 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 December 2022 17 November 2023 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2022 28 January 2024 119 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 December 2021 30 November 2022 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 December 2021 30 November 2022 60 days late Download Open in new window