Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF WOMEN

Charity number: 1195366
Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 April 2025 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 August 2024 202 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 February 2023 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 February 2023 5 days late Download Open in new window