Accounts and annual returns EVERLASTING FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1195104
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 23 February 2024 23 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 February 2024 23 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 23 February 2023 03 January 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 February 2023 03 January 2024 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 23 February 2022 22 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 23 February 2022 22 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window