Financial history THE SURGICAL GASTRO ENTEROLOGICAL RESEARCH AND TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 517789
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011
Total gross income £730 £758 £1.57k £0 £0
Total expenditure £9.50k £8.82k £484 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A