Accounts and annual returns GATEWAY BOOKSHOP

Charity number: 517792
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2012 07 February 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2011 15 February 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2010 10 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 Not Required