Accounts and annual returns CHRISTIAN ACTION MINISTRY INTERNATIONAL CHURCH

Charity Number: 1194755
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 November 2023 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 November 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required