Financial history APEX LEICESTER PROJECT LIMITED

Charity number: 518081
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017
Total gross income £858.26k £880.90k £472.09k £191.08k £0
Total expenditure £1.02m £992.15k £829.32k £430.12k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £290.57k £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £11.37k £26.46k £0
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £664.82k £726.75k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £170.90k £146.91k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £22.54k £7.24k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £952.69k £919.57k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £14.43k £33.13k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £57.77k £39.45k N/A N/A N/A