Accounts and annual returns SEARCH AND SCAN

Charity number: 1196253
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 21 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 21 May 2024 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 16 June 2024 132 days late Download Open in new window