Accounts and annual returns WATER PRESERVATION & ENERGY RENEWAL CHARITY

Charity Number: 1197851
Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2024 03 November 2024 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 200 days
Annual return 01 January 2023 22 February 2024 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2023 29 February 2024 120 days late Download Open in new window