Accounts and annual returns HARBY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 518145
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2018 03 July 2019 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 03 July 2019 3 days late
Annual return 31 August 2017 22 June 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 June 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2016 04 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required