Accounts and annual returns LINCOLN MIND

Charity number: 518470
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 26 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2012 31 January 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 30 May 2012 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 10 April 2012 70 days late
Annual return 31 March 2010 24 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 24 January 2011 On Time