Accounts and annual returns RUGELEY OPEN SPACES ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 518588
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2006 15 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2005 08 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required
Annual return 10 April 2004 27 July 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 April 2004 Not Required