Accounts and annual returns INTERNATIONAL SUMMER SCHOOL OF MUSIC AT SHREWSBURY (ISSMUS)

Charity number: 518703
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2011 24 August 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 24 August 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2010 23 December 2011 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 23 December 2011 53 days late
Annual return 31 December 2009 08 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 08 October 2010 On Time