Financial history JOHN BROWN MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity Number: 518747
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £2.83k £2.16k £1.60k £4.20k £5.26k
Total expenditure £4.56k £7.54k £10.75k £4.57k £7.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A