Accounts and annual returns FAIRWOOD TRUST

Charity number: 518759
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2017 13 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2016 16 August 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 August 2017 On Time