Accounts and annual returns SHANTI BHAVAN CHILDRENS PROJECT: U.K. CHAPTER

Charity number: 1197099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 24 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 20 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 June 2024 140 days late Download Open in new window