Accounts and annual returns MULTINATION CHURCH LONDON

Charity number: 1196027
Charity reporting is overdue by 348 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 27 August 2024 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 348 days
Annual return 31 July 2022 25 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 31 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window