Accounts and annual returns HARVEST TRUST

Charity Number: 519116
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 23 March 2016 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 23 March 2016 417 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 23 March 2016 782 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 23 March 2016 782 days late