Financial history LLANELLI FREE EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity number: 519123
Charity reporting is overdue by 88 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £80.43k £93.08k £67.02k £65.42k £62.68k
Total expenditure £66.40k £75.33k £72.81k £70.53k £73.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A