Accounts and annual returns BEARTOWN RICKSHAW

Charity number: 1197671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 25 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 16 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 22 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 14 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window