Accounts and annual returns FORSTER CHILDREN'S CHARITY

Charity number: 1198363
Charity reporting is up to date (81 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 10 March 2025 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 23 April 2025 81 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2023 23 May 2024 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 23 May 2024 112 days late Download Open in new window