Accounts and annual returns RADIO PHOENIX (NEATH PORT TALBOT HOSPITAL BROADCASTING)
Charity number: 519313

Charity reporting is overdue by 942 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 211 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 211 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 577 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 577 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 942 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 942 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 13 April 2022 | 195 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 10 November 2020 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window