Accounts and annual returns CLUB SFC

Charity number: 1199294
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 06 February 2025 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 06 February 2025 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 April 2024 77 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 02 August 2024 184 days late Download Open in new window