Financial history THE PEMBROKESHIRE ANIMAL WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 519559
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £96 £37 £18 £42 £303
Total expenditure £1.53k £900 £2.29k £1.67k £2.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A