Accounts and annual returns ISLINGTON FESTIVAL OF MUSIC AND ART

Charity number: 1198568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 02 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 28 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window