Financial history LIGHTHOUSE PROJECT (NORTH WEST)

Charity number: 519859
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £4.21m £4.87m £5.93m £7.71m £8.75m
Total expenditure £3.38m £4.68m £6.17m £7.90m £9.50m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £5.66k £715
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £8.77k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £7.63m £8.68m
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £10.67k £22.19k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £63.35k £41.35k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £6.33m £7.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £1.57m £1.69m
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £3.41k