Trustees HELP BEYOND TEARS

Charity number: 1201372
Charity reporting is up to date (54 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Achier Deng Akol MBBS, PhD Chair 02 April 2022
None on record
Eve Hickingbottom Trustee 27 April 2022
None on record
Leah Fox Trustee 21 April 2022
None on record
Ayay Akol Trustee 17 April 2022
None on record
Deng Akol Trustee 17 April 2022
None on record
Lindsey Carver Trustee 02 April 2022
None on record
Victoria But Trustee 02 April 2022
None on record
Joanne Aldhouse Trustee 28 March 2022
None on record
Samantha Kousoula Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
Nina Madden Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
Paris Jones Trustee 23 March 2022
None on record
Emily Cresswell Trustee 23 March 2022
None on record