Accounts and annual returns THE WHITWORTH CENTRE
Charity Number: 520445
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2007 | 01 October 2008 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2007 | 09 October 2008 | 39 days late | |
Annual return | 31 October 2006 | 09 July 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2006 | 09 July 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2005 | 16 June 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2005 | 16 June 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | 21 June 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | 14 April 2005 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window