Trustees FIRST DUFFIELD BOY SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 520655

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jessica Slack | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ying Qian | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Morton | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Dixon | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sian Skerritt | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Osman | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelly-Ann Kemp | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Nitesh Patel | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen Furness | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Kent Butterworth | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.