Accounts and annual returns DE-REBIRTH

Charity number: 1200855
Charity reporting is up to date (16 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 May 2024 08 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 18 May 2024 03 April 2025 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 18 May 2023 02 August 2024 137 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 May 2023 02 August 2024 137 days late Download Open in new window