Trustees FROMES HILL VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 520934

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Keswick | Chair | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Hollocks | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Marshall | Trustee | 10 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Black Fallas | Trustee | 07 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pauleen Baldwin | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Terrence Baldwin | Trustee | 01 December 2004 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.