Trustees VILLAGE HALL HOPE MANSELL
Charity number: 520957

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kenneth Robert Young | Trustee | 29 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Heath | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Lesley Wheeler | Trustee | 21 January 2019 |
|
|||||
ELAINE SHAW | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Hollinshead | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Lewis | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jan Powell | Trustee | 13 April 2017 |
|
|||||
David Weber | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Dunkerley Leathart | Trustee | 19 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE MARY GODFREY | Trustee | 19 September 2013 |
|
|||||
TERRY FINCH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.