Financial history SELLACK VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 520982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.40k £26.21k £18.45k £10.45k £17.37k
Total expenditure £3.39k £27.84k £26.78k £14.90k £14.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.33k N/A N/A N/A