Accounts and annual returns CHORLEY UNIT NO 526 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 521071
Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 March 2022 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2021 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required