Trustees THE URMSTON & DISTRICT WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 1201995

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Glenys Elizabeth Beckett | Chair | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Duncan | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Mary Holt | Trustee | 07 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Susan Hart | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Richardson | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Lynne Casey | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shelagh Mary Stephens | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Roberts | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Lomax | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jean Platt | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Mary Stephens | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wootton | Trustee | 05 November 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.