Trustees HULL RED CIO
Charity number: 1204452
Recently registered
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kathryn McBride | Chair | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Ann Elmore | Trustee | 04 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Jane Norton | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Hinsby | Trustee | 04 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karen Helbrow | Trustee | 23 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Billingsley | Trustee | 23 May 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.