Financial history BELTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £27.65k £23.72k £23.72k £22.64k £23.46k
Total expenditure £24.32k £21.13k £21.13k £17.79k £17.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £250
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £10.00k N/A £500