Financial history COSBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521404
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £39.77k £16.35k £35.13k £38.62k £38.86k
Total expenditure £41.66k £18.59k £17.83k £29.11k £35.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £300 £300
Income from government grants N/A £10.38k £8.00k N/A N/A