Financial history Thurcaston and Cropston Memorial Hall

Charity number: 521512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.52k £22.76k £8.34k £18.98k £21.73k
Total expenditure £8.15k £12.81k £11.05k £17.59k £29.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.00k N/A N/A N/A