Financial history VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521515
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.36k £26.51k £16.52k £7.64k £19.66k
Total expenditure £9.94k £5.78k £12.00k £20.39k £17.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A £22.76k £12.36k N/A £2.24k