Financial history EAST LANCASHIRE COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 521711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £120.36k £58.27k £78.39k £178.38k £106.51k
Total expenditure £135.36k £53.05k £72.85k £154.27k £95.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £18.72k £5.89k N/A N/A