Financial history 112TH LEICESTER (LITTLE HILL, WIGSTON MAGNA) SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 521760
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £4.71k £3.89k £4.54k £4.53k £2.61k
Total expenditure £5.34k £4.11k £6.11k £5.57k £2.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A