Trustees LA SALLE HOSPITALITY EDUCATION CHARITY

Charity number: 1205274
Recently registered

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gerald Proctor MBE Chair 01 November 2023
None on record
Daniel Lewis Trustee 03 July 2024
None on record
Caroline Dawson Trustee 01 May 2024
None on record
Gaynor Black Trustee 03 January 2024
None on record
David Martin Hayes Trustee 06 December 2023
None on record
Christopher Julian Brown Trustee 01 November 2023
None on record