Accounts and annual returns TIMBERLAND VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 521874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 January 2025 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 April 2024 176 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 07 December 2020 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required