Financial history EAST FERRY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 521915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £232 £460 £569 £904 £454
Total expenditure £354 £345 £504 £436 £90
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A