Financial history BARNBY MOOR VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 522190
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.84k £10.65k £1.85k £680 £0
Total expenditure £16.46k £3.37k £4.16k £1.42k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.51k £10.00k N/A N/A N/A