Financial history KEYWORTH PLAYING FIELD

Charity number: 522231
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £25.27k £20.63k £17.20k £5.22k £4.11k
Total expenditure £23.99k £22.69k £24.11k £7.37k £6.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A