Financial history THE RUSSELL YOUTH CLUB, NOTTINGHAM

Charity number: 522278
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012
Total gross income £17.11k £17.46k £23.38k £20.99k £20.67k
Total expenditure £18.56k £18.83k £27.85k £21.38k £22.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A